EP0635956 - Encryption apparatus, communication system using the same and method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwamura, Keiichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Takahisa, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305221.7 | 15.07.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | JP19930179232 | 20.07.1993 Original published format: JP 17923293 | JP19930179241 | 20.07.1993 Original published format: JP 17924193 | [1995/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0635956 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0635956 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635956 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/22 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
H04L9/0668 (EP,US);
H04L2209/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Kommunikationssystem unter Verwendung einer Verschlüsselungseinrichtung | [1995/04] | English: | Encryption apparatus, communication system using the same and method therefor | [1995/04] | French: | Procédé et système de communication utilisant un dispositif cryptographique | [1995/04] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 20.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Request for further processing for: | 28.02.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 12.03.2001 | Decision despatched | 20.12.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.2000 | Decision despatched | 24.03.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 15.04.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.10.2003 | BE | 22.10.2003 | CH | 22.10.2003 | ES | 22.10.2003 | IT | 22.10.2003 | LI | 22.10.2003 | NL | 22.10.2003 | DK | 22.01.2004 | GR | 22.01.2004 | SE | 22.01.2004 | PT | 22.03.2004 | IE | 15.07.2004 | LU | 15.07.2004 | [2008/05] |
Former [2007/16] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
ES | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
IE | 15.07.2004 | ||
LU | 15.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
IE | 15.07.2004 | ||
LU | 15.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
LU | 15.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 22.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1549067 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 5* page 6, line 3 - line 16 *; | [A]DE2706421 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 60 *; | [YA]US4369434 (MUELLER KURT H [CH]) [Y] 1,2,12,14,17 * column 1, line 43 - line 51 * * column 3, line 36 - line 45 * * column 4, line 21 - line 28 * [A] 3; | [XY]US4860353 (BROWN DAVID S [US]) [X] 1,12,13,17-19 * column 1, line 11 - line 23 * * sentence 38 - sentence 41 * * column 2, line 13 - line 19 * * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 2 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 35 * * column 7, line 62 - column 8, line 10 * [Y] 1,2,12,14,17; | [A]US5073935 (PASTOR JOSE [US]) [A] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 38 * | [DA] - B. CHOR ET AL., "RSA/Rabin least significant bits are 1/2 + 1/poly (log N) secure", PROCEEDINGS OF CRYPTO '84, NEW YORK, (1984), pages 303 - 313 [DA] 9 * abstract * |