EP0635531 - Liquid copolymers of epsilon-caprolactone and lactide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON INC. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876-0151 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states ETHICON INC. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876-0151 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bezwada, Rao S. 1 Nevius Road Whitehouse Station, New Jersey 08889 / US | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305274.6 | 19.07.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | US19930095128 | 20.07.1993 Original published format: US 95128 | [1995/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0635531 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0635531 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635531 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/08, A61L17/00, A61L29/00, A61K9/20 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
C08G63/08 (EP);
A61K47/34 (EP);
A61K9/204 (EP);
A61L17/105 (EP);
A61L17/145 (EP);
A61L31/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/10, A61B17/06, C08L67/04 (EP);
A61L31/10, C08L67/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/04] | Title | German: | Flüssige Copolymere aus E-Caprolacton und Lactide | [1995/04] | English: | Liquid copolymers of epsilon-caprolactone and lactide | [1995/04] | French: | Copolymères liquides à partir d'E-caprolactone et de lactide | [1995/04] | Examination procedure | 26.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 10.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9407470 (PFIZER) [PX] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0314245 (C. C. A. BIOCHEM) [X] 1-4 * claims 1-10 *; | [X]EP0509203 (JÜRGENS, CHRISTIAN) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2635685 (G-C DENTAL INDUSTRIAL CORPORATION) [X] 1-4 * claims 1-8 * |