EP0636908 - Wavelength division multiplexed optical communication transmitters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.1999 [1999/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1995/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koch, Thomas Lawson 12 Donner Street Holmdel, New Jersey 07733 / US | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305370.2 | 20.07.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | US19930097692 | 27.07.1993 Original published format: US 97692 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636908 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0636908 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/12, G02B6/42, G02B6/28, H01L27/144, H01S3/025, H01S3/25 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
G02B6/12004 (EP,US);
G02B6/12007 (EP,US);
G02B6/125 (EP,US);
G02B6/4246 (EP,US);
H01L27/1443 (EP,US);
H01S5/026 (EP,US);
H01S5/4025 (EP,US);
H01S5/0265 (EP,US);
H01S5/0268 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/05] | Title | German: | Optischer Nachrichtensender für Wellenlängenmultiplex | [1999/01] | English: | Wavelength division multiplexed optical communication transmitters | [1995/05] | French: | Emetteur de communication optique en multiplexage de longueur d'onde | [1995/05] |
Former [1995/05] | Optische Nachrichtensender für Wellenlängenmultiplex | Examination procedure | 20.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 25.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60176289 ; | [A]JPH0313906 ; | [A]EP0304065 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,15 * column 4, line 1 - line 20; figure 2 *; | [X] - B.GLANCE ET.AL., "Discretly-tuned N-frequency laser for pacet switching applications based on WDM", ELECTRONICS LETTERS., ENAGE GB, (19910718), vol. 27, no. 15, pages 1381 - 1383 [X] 1-3,10,13 * page 1382, column 2, line 22 - line 29 * * figure 4 * | [A] - T.L.KOCH ET.AL., "InP-based photonic integrated circuits", IEE PROCEEDINGS J. OPTOELECTRONICS, STEVENAGE GB, (199104), vol. 138, no. 2, pages 139 - 147, XP000226517 [A] 1,7-10,12,13 * page 145, column 1, line 22 - line 39 * * figure 12 * | [A] - G.RAYBON ET.AL., "1.7Gbit/s transmission over 217km using 16x1 photonic integrated circuit transmitter", ELECTRONICS LETTERS., ENAGE GB, (19930708), vol. 29, no. 14, pages 1295 - 1296 [A] 1,7,8,13,14 * page 1295, line 1 - line 37; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860117), vol. 10, no. 11, Database accession no. (E - 374), & JP60176289 A 00000000 (SUMITOMO DENKI) [A] 1-3,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910329), vol. 15, no. 131, Database accession no. (P - 1186), & JP03013906 A 00000000 (NTT) [A] 16 * abstract * |