Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0637698
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.02.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |
05.03.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.04.1999 [1999/16] |
25.01.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.10.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
20.10.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.10.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.08.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
21.07.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.02.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.09.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.03.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.11.1996 |
First examination report |
|
30.10.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.07.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.06.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] |
21.12.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.02.1995 [1995/06] |