EP0639024 - Apparatus and method for screening images for reproduction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCITEX CORPORATION LTD. 7 Hamada Street Herzliya 46103 / IL | [1995/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gershony, Moshe 2 Tzivoni Street Kfar Sava 44 413 / IL | 02 /
Fisher, Gil 1 Leah Goldberg Street Petach Tikva 49 447 / IL | [1995/07] | Representative(s) | Hillier, Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | Hillier, Peter, et al Reginald W. Barker & Co., Chancery House, 53-64, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305479.1 | 25.07.1994 | [1995/07] | Priority number, date | IL19930106514 | 28.07.1993 Original published format: IL 10651493 | [1995/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639024 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0639024 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/405 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
H04N1/4056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/07] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Reproduktionsbildrasterung | [1995/07] | English: | Apparatus and method for screening images for reproduction | [1995/07] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour l'obtention de trames d'images pour la reproduction | [1995/07] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/23] | 25.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.04.1999 | [2008/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0141869 (HELL RUDOLF DR ING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5-10 * page 13, line 4 - page 14, line 11 * [Y] 2-4; | [A]US5111310 (PARKER KEVIN J [US], et al); | [Y]EP0540221 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [Y] 2-4 * claims 1-3,7,8 *; | [X] - J. P. ALLEBACH, "Random Nucleated Halftone Screen", PHOTOGRAPHIC SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, WASHINGTON (US), (197803), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 89 - 91, XP001392204 [X] 1,5,6 * page 89, column L, paragraph 2 - page 90, column R, paragraph 1 * |