EP0636343 - Collection assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | ||
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burns, James A 1104 Kipling Road Elizabeth, New Jersey 07208 / US | 02 /
Prais, Alois G. 20 East Park Place Rutherford, New Jersey 07070 / US | 03 /
Szeles, Laszlo. 1275 Old Farm Road Mountainside, New Jersey 07092 / US | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305530.1 | 27.07.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | US19930099678 | 29.07.1993 Original published format: US 99678 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636343 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0636343 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/14, B01L3/14 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
B65D41/17 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150259 (EP,US);
A61B5/150343 (EP,US);
A61B5/150351 (EP,US);
B01L3/5082 (EP,US);
C07C17/206 (EP,US);
C07C17/23 (EP,US);
C07C17/278 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C17/206, C07C19/10 (EP,US);
C07C17/23, C07C19/08 (US,EP);
C07C17/278, C07C19/01 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/05] | Title | German: | Abnahmeröhrchen | [1995/05] | English: | Collection assembly | [1995/05] | French: | Récipient pour prélèvement | [1995/05] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 05.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 09.12.1998 | [1999/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3005564 (WEICHSELBAUM EDWIN G) [A] 1-3,7,8* column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 30; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US3902477 (GERARDE HORACE W) [A] 1-3,7,8 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 31; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0146074 (TERUMO MEDICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,7,8 * page 6, line 5 - page 9, line 12; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]EP0517119 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * column 4, line 7 - column 7, line 3; figures 1-8 * [A] 6,9,10 |