EP0638383 - Abrasive tool insert [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flood, Gary Martin 10400 Miller Avenue Canal Winchester, Ohio 43110 / US | 02 /
Johnson, David M. 1172 Lori Lane Westerville, Ohio 43081 / US | 03 /
Marek, Henry Samuel 1475 Oakbourne Drive Worthington, Ohio 43235 / US | [1995/07] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al London Patent Operation, GE Technical Services Co. Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1995/07] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305693.7 | 01.08.1994 | [1995/07] | Priority number, date | US19930105523 | 11.08.1993 Original published format: US 105523 | [1995/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0638383 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0638383 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/14, E21B10/56 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
E21B10/5735 (EP,US);
B23B27/146 (EP,US);
B23B2226/125 (EP,US);
B23B2226/315 (EP,US);
Y10T407/2288 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/07] | Title | German: | Schleifender Werkzeugeinsatz | [1995/07] | English: | Abrasive tool insert | [1995/07] | French: | Plaquette d'outil abrasive | [1995/07] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 03.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4504284 (OHNO JOHN M [US]) [A] 1,9,10* figure 1 *; | [XA]EP0369852 (COMBUSTIBLE NUCLEAIRE [FR]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 8; figures 1,2 * [A] 7,9,10; | [X]EP0389800 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-5 * figure 4 * |