EP0637815 - Image processing method and image processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/06] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katayama, Akihiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Koichiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/06] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/06] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305725.7 | 02.08.1994 | [1995/06] | Priority number, date | JP19930193737 | 04.08.1993 Original published format: JP 19373793 | JP19930271698 | 29.10.1993 Original published format: JP 27169893 | [1995/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0637815 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0637815 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0637815 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/10 | [1995/06] | CPC: |
G06T15/205 (EP,US);
G09G3/003 (EP,US);
G09G5/397 (EP,US);
H04N13/117 (EP,US);
H04N13/128 (EP,US);
H04N13/239 (EP,US);
H04N13/243 (EP,US);
H04N13/305 (EP,US);
H04N13/349 (EP,US);
H04N13/373 (EP,US);
H04N13/376 (EP,US);
H04N13/38 (EP,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,US);
G09G2320/106 (EP,US);
G09G2340/10 (EP,US);
G09G2354/00 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N13/246 (EP,US);
H04N13/257 (EP,US);
H04N13/286 (EP,US);
H04N13/337 (EP,US);
H04N13/341 (EP,US);
H04N13/344 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/06] | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsverfahren und -gerät | [1995/06] | English: | Image processing method and image processing apparatus | [1995/06] | French: | Méthode et appareil de traitement d'image | [1995/06] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 22.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 05.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Request for further processing for: | 05.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2006 | Decision despatched | 29.11.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 29.11.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.12.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.04.2006 | NL | 05.04.2006 | [2008/05] |
Former [2007/21] | NL | 05.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9008343 (SANDIN DANIEL J [US], et al); | [X]GB2256567 (SONY BROADCAST & COMMUNICATION [GB]) [X] 1,6-10,12,17-21,24,33,34 * the whole document *; | [X] - ROWLEY, ""VIRTUALITY" ENTERTAINMENT SYSTEMS", PROCEEDINGS CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER GRAPHICS, (1990), pages 19 - 28, XP000603166 [X] 1,2,6-10,12,13,17-22,30,33,34 * the whole document * | [X] - DEVARAJAN AND HOOKS, "LOW ALTITUDE HIGH SPEED FLIGHT SIMULATION USING VIDEO DISC TECHNOLOGY", LTV AEROSPACE AND DEFENSE COMPANY, (19850725), pages 54 - 65 [X] 1-8,12-19,23-34 * the whole document * |