EP0641853 - Method of demulsifying water-in-oil emulsions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NALCO/EXXON ENERGY CHEMICALS L.P. 7701 Highway 90-A Sugarland Texas 77478 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/26] | For all designated states NALCO/EXXON ENERGY CHEMICALS L.P. 7701 Highway 90-A Sugarland, Texas / US | ||
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 1900 East Linden Avenue Linden, New Jersey 07036-0710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taylor, Grahame N. 16438 De Lozier Houston, Texas 77040 / US | 02 /
Mgla, Richard 32 Woodacres Place, S.W. Calgary, Alberta, T2W 4W1 / CA | [1995/10] | Representative(s) | Sexton, Jane Helen, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Sexton, Jane Helen, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305807.3 | 04.08.1994 | [1995/10] | Priority number, date | US19930107288 | 16.08.1993 Original published format: US 107288 | US19940245416 | 18.05.1994 Original published format: US 245416 | [1995/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0641853 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0641853 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0641853 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C10G33/04, B01D17/04 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
B01D17/047 (EP,US);
C10G33/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/10] | Title | German: | Methode zum Demulgieren von Wasser-in-Öl-Emulsionen | [1995/10] | English: | Method of demulsifying water-in-oil emulsions | [1995/10] | French: | Méthode de désémulsification d'émulsions eau dans l'huile | [1995/10] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 19.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0055433 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,7,15 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0055434 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,3 *; | [A]EP0073479 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * claims 1,2 *; | [AD]US2754271 (KIRKPATRICK WILLARD H) [AD] 1,4 * claims 1,8 *; | [AD]US3383326 (SEALE VIRGIL L, et al) [AD] 1,6 * column W *; | [AD]US3676501 (SEALE VIRGIL L, et al) [AD] 1,4,6 * column 11, line 1 - line 60; claim 1 * |