EP0640661 - Antibacterial and antifungal silicone rubber compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Yoshio 3-21, Isobe 4-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Sekiguchi, Susumu Sakuragaoka Ryo D-104, 13-37, Isobe 3-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Kurihara, Yasuo 4-22, Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 94305897.4 | 10.08.1994 | [1995/09] | Priority number, date | JP19930235798 | 27.08.1993 Original published format: JP 23579893 | [1995/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0640661 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0640661 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0640661 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04, C08K3/34, C08K9/02, C08K3/00 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
C08K9/02 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (KR);
C08K3/34 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08K9/02, C08L83/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/09] | C08L83/04, C08K3/34, C08K9/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/09] | Title | German: | Antibakterielle, pilzhemmende Silikonkautschuk-Zusammensetzungen | [1999/01] | English: | Antibacterial and antifungal silicone rubber compositions | [1995/09] | French: | Compositions de caoutchouc de silicone antibactériel et antifongique | [1995/09] |
Former [1995/09] | Antibakterielle, antifungische Siloxonkautschukzusammensetzungen | Examination procedure | 22.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/04] | 03.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0488269 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-13 * claims 1,15-17 * * page 1, line 10 - line 16 * * page 4, line 9 - line 13 * * page 4, line 57 * * page 5, line 43 - line 50 * * page 3, line 3 - line 5 *; | [X]JPH04104219 ; | [X]JPH02283312 ; | [PA]US5320843 (RAHEJA MANOHAR K [US], et al) [PA] 1 * claims 1-5 * * column 3, line 31 - line 40 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 15 *; | [A]EP0270129 (SHINAGAWA FUEL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP0288063 (SHINAGAWA FUEL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-7,15 *; | [PA]EP0588601 (TOKUYAMA SODA KK [JP]) [PA] 1 * claims 1,20,22 * * page 4, line 34 - line 40 * * page 9, line 38 - line 53 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 92-170523, & JPH04104219 A 19920406 (HOYA CORP.) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 91-004868, & JPH02283312 A 19901120 (SANPO SEIYAKU KK.) [X] 1 * abstract * |