EP0640836 - Immunoassay method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.03.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAKO PURE CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD 1-2 Doshomachi-3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states WAKO PURE CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD 1-2 Doshomachi-3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ushio, Yoshihior, c/o Osaka Kenkyusho Wako Pure Chemical Ind., Ltd., 6-1, Takatacho Amagasaki-shi / JP | 02 /
Aoki, Katsuji, c/o Osaka Kenkyusho Wako Pure Chemical Industries, Ltd. 6-1, Takatacho, Amagasaki-shi / JP | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/12] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/47] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Langner Parry 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | ||
Former [1995/09] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94306064.0 | 17.08.1994 | [1995/09] | Priority number, date | JP19930230866 | 24.08.1993 Original published format: JP 23086693 | JP19930230867 | 24.08.1993 Original published format: JP 23086793 | [1995/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0640836 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0640836 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/58 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
G01N33/53 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/58 (EP,US);
Y10S436/815 (EP,US);
Y10S436/817 (EP,US);
Y10S436/82 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/09] | Title | German: | Immunotestverfahren | [1995/09] | English: | Immunoassay method | [1995/09] | French: | Méthode d'immunoessai | [1995/09] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/28] | 12.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/20] | 18.01.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0451810 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,10,11,13-16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0315317 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,10,11,13-16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0524583 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2098730 (WELSH NAT SCHOOL MED); | [A]GB2261948 (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB]); | [PX]JPH0682449 | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 16, Database accession no. 94-132669, & JPH0682449 A 19940322 (IGAKU SEIBUTSUGAKU KENKYUSHO KK) [PX] 1 * abstract * |