Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
31.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] |
12.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
31.10.1995 | Publication of search report | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] |
13.01.1995 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] |