Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5631191 | 20.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US11222693 | 27.08.1993 | US44092495 | 15.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0641019 | Global Dossier | 20.12.1995 | A3 | EP0641019 | 01.03.1995 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US11222693 | 27.08.1993 |