EP0644428 - Oscilloscope casing structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI DENSHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states HITACHI DENSHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nita, Fujio Tsutsujino Danchi 1-24-308 259-1, Kamihirose, Sayama-shi / JP | 02 /
Natori, Kazuya 18-1, Onumacho-1-chome Kodaira-shi / JP | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 94306716.5 | 14.09.1994 | [1995/12] | Priority number, date | JP19930257694 | 21.09.1993 Original published format: JP 25769493 | JP19930056494U | 25.09.1993 Original published format: JP 5649493 U | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0644428 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0644428 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/04, G01R13/00 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
G01R13/202 (EP,US);
G01R1/04 (EP,KR,US);
G01R1/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/12] | Title | German: | Oszilloskopgehäuseaufbau | [1995/12] | English: | Oscilloscope casing structure | [1995/12] | French: | Structure de boîtier d'oscilloscope | [1995/12] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 11.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/32] | 17.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE2544489 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG) [Y] 11 * page 4, paragraph 2 * [A] 8; | [Y]US3978470 (MCGUIRE LAWRENCE T) [Y] 8-11 * column A; claims 1,8 * * column 3, line 22 - line 25 * * column 5, line 37 - line 39 * * column 10, line 17 - line 23 *; | [XY] - Klein,stark, schnell: Das Multiscope, DE, PHILIPS, (1987) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 11 | [X] - W.HAUSSEL, "Ein neues Messgerät zum gleichzeitigen Messen, Abbilden und Speichern", BROWN BOVERI TECHNIK, DE, (198501), pages 47 - 51 [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - L.SIMPSON, "Liquid Crystal", ELECTRONICS AUSTRALIA, AU, (198510), vol. 47, no. 10, pages 62 - 73 [X] 1 * page 63; figure - * * page 67; figure . * * page 71; figure . * | [A] - "Messplatz für die Westentasche", ELEKTRONIK, DE, (198604), vol. 35, no. 8, pages 126 - 130 [A] 1,11 * abstract * | [XP] - T.OKADA, "Color TFT LCD Forms Core of B5, Notebook Color Digital Oscilloscope", JOURNAL ELECTR. ENG., JP, (199402), vol. 31, no. 326, pages 34 - 37, XP002007087 [XP] 1-11 * the whole document * | [X] - C.H.SMALL, "Digital oscilloscope traces with liquid-crystal color shutter", EDN, US, (198309), vol. 28, no. 19, pages 80 - 84, XP001459807 [X] 8-11 * page 80, column M, paragraph 1; figure . * * page 82, column M, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 82, column R, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - J.MURCH ET AL., "Colour - the logical step", NEW ELECTRONICS, GB, (198206), vol. 15, no. 12, pages 28 - 32, XP001459710 [Y] 8-11 * page 31, column L, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * | [AX] - "Digital-Speicheroszilloskop mit Elektrolumineszenz-Bildschirm", ELEKTRONIK, DE, (198801), vol. 37, no. 1, pages 90 - 93 [A] 8 * page 91, column R, paragraph L - page 92, column L, line 2; figures 1,2,8 * [X] 1 |