EP0644711 - Ionizing air gun [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025-5811 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodrigo, Richard D. 920 Hilltown Pike City of Line Lexington, Pennsylvania / US | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94306825.4 | 19.09.1994 | [1995/12] | Priority number, date | US19930123927 | 20.09.1993 Original published format: US 123927 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644711 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0644711 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H05F3/04 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
H05F3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/12] | Title | German: | Ionisations-Druckluftpistole | [1996/46] | English: | Ionizing air gun | [1995/12] | French: | Pistolet d'ionisation à air comprimé | [1995/12] |
Former [1995/12] | Ionisations Druckluftpistole | Examination procedure | 01.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 05.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.11.1996 | BE | 13.11.1996 | DK | 13.11.1996 | ES | 13.11.1996 | FR | 13.11.1996 | IT | 13.11.1996 | NL | 13.11.1996 | SE | 13.02.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
DK | 13.11.1996 | ||
ES | 13.11.1996 | ||
IT | 13.11.1996 | ||
NL | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
FR | 11.04.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
DK | 13.11.1996 | ||
ES | 13.11.1996 | ||
IT | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
FR | 11.04.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
DK | 13.11.1996 | ||
IT | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
FR | 11.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
DK | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
FR | 11.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/44] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
FR | 11.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 13.11.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3156847 (HAROLD SCHWERINER) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 37 - line 58 ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3643128 (TESTONE ANTHONY Q) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 24 - line 40 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4046492 (INGLIS LESLIE R) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4514779 (WILKINSON JOHN S [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 3,6 * * column 2, line 54 - line 66 *; | [A]NL9001225 (SIMCO NEDERLAND) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 * | [A] - M.H. BJERKE ET AL., "Minimum contamination during manufacture of disk drives", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (198212), vol. 25, no. 7B, pages 3685 - 3686 [A] 1 * page 3686, line 1 - line 10; figure 4 * |