EP0681139 - Device for plugging the interior of a pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDW DELAWARE, INC. 1100 Market Street Suite 780 Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states TDW DELAWARE, INC. 1100 Market Street Suite 780 Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freeman, Eric N. Route 2, Box 318-C Sapulpa, Oklahoma 74066 / US | 02 /
Blevins, David L. 1006 East 66th Place South No. 326 Tulsa, Oklahoma 74136 / US | 03 /
Ralls, Gene R. 5621 South Zunis Tulsa, Oklahoma 74105 / US | 04 /
Andrew, Bill D. 2662 East 22nd Street Tulsa, Oklahoma 74114 / US | 05 /
Wilson, Buddy A. 1323 East Fairview Street Sapulpa, Oklahoma 74066 / US | 06 /
Osburn, Coy D. 8515 South 33rd West Avenue Tulsa, Oklahoma 74132 / US | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 94307213.2 | 03.10.1994 | [1995/45] | Priority number, date | US19940238430 | 05.05.1994 Original published format: US 238430 | [1995/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0681139 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0681139 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0681139 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/105, F16L55/124, F16L55/00 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
F16L55/105 (EP,US);
F16L55/124 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/45] | F16L55/105 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Absperren des Innenraumes eines Rohres | [1995/45] | English: | Device for plugging the interior of a pipe | [1995/45] | French: | Dispositif pour obturer l'intérieur d'un tuyau | [1995/45] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/03] | 17.11.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02078530.9 / EP1271041 | EP99202997.5 / EP0984217 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.04.2000 | CH | 19.04.2000 | ES | 19.04.2000 | GR | 19.04.2000 | LI | 19.04.2000 | NL | 19.04.2000 | DK | 19.07.2000 | PT | 19.07.2000 | SE | 19.07.2000 | IE | 03.10.2000 | LU | 03.10.2000 | MC | 31.10.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 19.04.2000 | |
CH | 19.04.2000 | ||
ES | 19.04.2000 | ||
GR | 19.04.2000 | ||
LI | 19.04.2000 | ||
NL | 19.04.2000 | ||
DK | 19.07.2000 | ||
PT | 19.07.2000 | ||
SE | 19.07.2000 | ||
IE | 03.10.2000 | ||
MC | 31.10.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 19.04.2000 | |
CH | 19.04.2000 | ||
ES | 19.04.2000 | ||
LI | 19.04.2000 | ||
NL | 19.04.2000 | ||
DK | 19.07.2000 | ||
PT | 19.07.2000 | ||
SE | 19.07.2000 | ||
IE | 03.10.2000 | ||
MC | 31.10.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 19.04.2000 | |
CH | 19.04.2000 | ||
ES | 19.04.2000 | ||
LI | 19.04.2000 | ||
NL | 19.04.2000 | ||
PT | 19.07.2000 | ||
SE | 19.07.2000 | ||
IE | 03.10.2000 | ||
MC | 31.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 19.04.2000 | |
CH | 19.04.2000 | ||
ES | 19.04.2000 | ||
LI | 19.04.2000 | ||
PT | 19.07.2000 | ||
SE | 19.07.2000 | ||
IE | 03.10.2000 | ||
MC | 31.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 19.04.2000 | |
CH | 19.04.2000 | ||
ES | 19.04.2000 | ||
LI | 19.04.2000 | ||
PT | 19.07.2000 | ||
SE | 19.07.2000 | ||
IE | 03.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/17] | AT | 19.04.2000 | |
CH | 19.04.2000 | ||
LI | 19.04.2000 | ||
PT | 19.07.2000 | ||
SE | 19.07.2000 | ||
IE | 03.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 19.04.2000 | |
CH | 19.04.2000 | ||
LI | 19.04.2000 | ||
PT | 19.07.2000 | ||
SE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/26] | AT | 19.04.2000 | |
PT | 19.07.2000 | ||
SE | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT | 19.04.2000 | |
PT | 19.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 19.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3025885 (VER NOOY BURTON); | [XY]GB1340431 (PASS & CO LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]US4202377 (HARRISON GEORGE W [US]) [Y] 2-4 * column 4, line 5 - column 4, line 49; figures 3,4 * |