Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0649245
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
29.10.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] |
06.11.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] |
27.10.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.09.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.06.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
05.06.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.05.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
18.03.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
07.01.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.10.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.10.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.10.1997 |
First examination report |
|
06.11.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.10.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] |
03.03.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] |