EP0648022 - Audio visual system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Shigeo, c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [1995/15] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94307321.3 | 05.10.1994 | [1995/15] | Priority number, date | JP19930252679 | 08.10.1993 Original published format: JP 25267993 | [1995/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0648022 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0648022 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/20, H04N5/765 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
H04N7/10 (EP,US);
H04N5/44 (KR);
H04B1/207 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/15] | H04B1/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/15] | Title | German: | AV-System | [1995/15] | English: | Audio visual system | [1995/15] | French: | Système audio-vidéo | [1995/15] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 08.10.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4746982 (SEEN MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 47; figures 2-5 *; | [A]US4845856 (ROCHETTE MARC [FR]) [A] 1,3,10* column A; figures 1-3 * |