Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] |
20.06.1997 | (Expected) grant | published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] |
02.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
04.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
06.11.1996 | Renewal fee | |
23.08.1996 | First examination report | |
17.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant | |
13.10.1995 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] |
03.03.1995 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] |