EP0649201 - Amplitude detection scheme for optical transmitter control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1995/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bosch, Fridolin Ludwig 1986 Ravenwood Drive Bethlehem, Pennsylvania 18018 / US | 02 /
Nguyen, Ton Van 2114 Allwood Drive Bethlehem, Pennsylvania 18018 / US | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94307454.2 | 12.10.1994 | [1995/16] | Priority number, date | US19930136358 | 14.10.1993 Original published format: US 136358 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0649201 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0649201 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/133, H01S3/103, H04B10/155 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
H04B10/504 (EP,US);
H01S5/06835 (EP,US);
H04B10/564 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/16] | Title | German: | Schema zur Amplitudenbestimmung zur Steuerung eines optischen Senders | [1995/16] | English: | Amplitude detection scheme for optical transmitter control | [1995/16] | French: | Méthode de détection de l'amplitude, pour le contrôle d'un transmetteur optique | [1995/16] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 22.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA1229653 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD) [A] 1,3,6,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0075295 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 6 - line 37 * * page 4, column 23 - page 5, column 33; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS6220388 ; | [A]JPS6327086 ; | [A]DE3242481 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870618), vol. 11, no. 190, Database accession no. (E - 517)<2637> , & JP62020388 A 19870128 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC) [A] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880705), vol. 12, no. 234, Database accession no. (E - 629)<3081> , & JP63027086 A 19880204 (NEC) [A] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * |