EP0650931 - Method for preventing activated sludge from losing its settling ability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kurita Water Industries Ltd. 4-7, Nishishinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states KURITA WATER INDUSTRIES LTD. 4-7, Nishishinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitatsuji, Katsura, c/o Kurita Water Ind. Ltd. 4-7 Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Chu, Kingo, c/o Kurita Water Industries Ltd. 4-7 Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Fukase, Tetsuro, c/o Kurita Water Industries Ltd. 4-7 Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94307682.8 | 19.10.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | JP19930265228 | 22.10.1993 Original published format: JP 26522893 | [1995/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0650931 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0650931 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0650931 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, C02F1/54 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
C02F3/12 (EP,US);
C02F1/54 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [1995/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schutz von Belebtschlamm vor Verlust seiner Absetzfähigkeit | [1995/18] | English: | Method for preventing activated sludge from losing its settling ability | [1995/18] | French: | Méthode pour éviter à une boue activée de pendre sa capacité de sedimentation | [1995/18] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 16.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Request for further processing for: | 14.06.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.06.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4732684 (FUJINO KIYOHARU [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 19 *; | [A]WO9009966 (MITSUBISHI KASEI POLYTEC CO [JP]); | [X]WO9014310 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU]) [X] 1-6 * page 3, line 31 - page 6, line 11; examples 1-10 * |