EP0651165 - Remote control assembly with vibration dampener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.1999 [1999/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFLEX INC 630 Germantown Pike, Suite 450 Plymouth Meeting Pennsylvania 19462 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states TELEFLEX INC 630 Germantown Pike, Suite 450 Plymouth Meeting, Pennsylvania 19462 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reasoner, Michael V. 245 Crescent Hill Ortonville, Michigan 48462 / US | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | Orr, William McLean Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | Orr, William McLean URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way Leeds West Yorkshire, LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94307689.3 | 19.10.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | US19930147390 | 03.11.1993 Original published format: US 147390 | [1995/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0651165 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0651165 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16C1/26 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
F16C1/265 (EP,US);
F16C1/102 (EP,US);
F16C1/105 (EP,US);
F16C1/108 (EP,US);
F16C1/26 (EP,US);
F16C2326/01 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/18] | Title | German: | Feinbedienungseinrichtung mit Schwingungsdämpfer | [1995/18] | English: | Remote control assembly with vibration dampener | [1995/18] | French: | Commande à distance avec amortisseur de vibrations | [1995/18] | Examination procedure | 08.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 06.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2005517 (ROOTES MOTORS LTD); | [A]US4304149 (HEIMANN ROBERT L) [A] 1,19 * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 18; figures 11,17 *; | [A]EP0359353 (TELEFLEX INC [US]); | [X]DE9306761U (VOFA-WERK XAVIER VORBRÜGGEN GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1-12,20 * the whole document * |