EP0650043 - Optical system for high-sensitivity reflectivity measurement equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JASCO CORPORATION 2967-5, Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | For all designated states JASCO CORPORATION 2967-5, Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawasaki, Kazuhiro, c/o JASCO Corporation 2967-5, Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192 / JP | [1995/17] | Representative(s) | Gordon, Michael Vincent GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [1995/17] | Application number, filing date | 94307746.1 | 21.10.1994 | [1995/17] | Priority number, date | JP19930288591 | 25.10.1993 Original published format: JP 28859193 | [1995/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0650043 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0650043 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/47, G02B5/10, G02B17/06 | [1995/17] | CPC: |
G01N21/55 (EP,US);
G02B19/0023 (EP,US);
G02B19/0085 (EP,US);
G02B19/009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1995/17] | Title | German: | Optisches System für eine Reflexionsmessungsvorrichtung mit hoher Empfindlichkeit | [1995/17] | English: | Optical system for high-sensitivity reflectivity measurement equipment | [1995/17] | French: | Système optique pour un équipement de mesure de réfléchissement à haute sensibilité | [1995/17] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 11.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS5719647 ; | [PX]JPH05340870 ; | [A]US5106196 (BRIERLEY PHILIP R [US]) [A] 1,3,5* column W *; | [YA]EP0489588 (SPECTRA TECH INC [US]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,5 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820520), vol. 6, no. 82, Database accession no. (P - 116), & JP57019647 A 19820201 (HITACHI) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 3 | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940324), vol. 18, no. 175, Database accession no. (P - 1716), & JP05340870 A 19931224 (SHIMADZU) [PX] 1,2 * abstract * |