EP0651544 - Personal communicator having a touch sensitive contol panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2002 [2002/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allard, David Joseph 3900 Greenfield Court Boynton Beach, Florida 33436 / US | 02 /
Canova, Francis James, Jr. 922 S.W. 35th Avenue Boynton Beach, Florida 33435 / US | 03 /
Johnson, Debra Ann Gawne 3040 N.E. 47th Street Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33308 / US | 04 /
Lanier, Charles Sterling 305 S.W. 27th Avenue Delray Beach, Florida 33445 / US | 05 /
Lewis, James Robert 5376 N.W. 55th Street Coconut Creek, Florida 33433 / US | 06 /
Villafana, William 2945 S.W. 111th Terrace Davie, Florida 33328 / US | 07 /
Wulf, James Christian 1106 South West 7th Street Boca Raton, Florida 33486 / US | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 94307982.2 | 28.10.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | US19930145914 | 01.11.1993 Original published format: US 145914 | [1995/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0651544 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0651544 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/00, H04M1/274 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
H04M11/066 (EP);
H04M1/27475 (EP);
H04M1/72403 (EP);
H04M1/72469 (EP);
H04M2250/22 (EP);
H04M2250/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/18] | Title | German: | Persönliches Kommunikationsgerät mit einer berührungsempfindlichen Steueranzeige | [1995/18] | English: | Personal communicator having a touch sensitive contol panel | [1995/18] | French: | Communicateur personnel muni d'un écran de commande tactile | [1995/18] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/44] | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/19] | 05.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH0486034 ; | [A]JPH0362216 ; | [A]JPS63118823 ; | [A]EP0422577 (MICROSLATE INC [CA]) [A] 1-8* column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 26; figures 3A-3G *; | [A]US5031119 (DULANEY KENNETH L [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 39; figure 1 *; | [YA]EP0499012 (OPTICAL IMAGING SYST [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-8 * column 5, line 52 - column 7, line 16; figure 1 * [A] 3; | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920707), vol. 016, no. 307, Database accession no. (E - 1229), & JP04086034 A 19920318 (TAMURA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [Y] 1,2,4-8 * abstract * [A] 3 | [YA] - "DYNAMIC KEYBOARD DISPLAY FOR TOUCH SCREENS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19920601), vol. 35, no. 1B, pages 340 - 341, XP000309090 [Y] 1,2,4-8 * the whole document * [A] 3 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910605), vol. 015, no. 220, Database accession no. (P - 1211), & JP03062216 A 19910318 (TOSHIBA CORP;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881004), vol. 012, no. 368, Database accession no. (P - 766), & JP63118823 A 19880523 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |