EP0710443 - Casings for containing paste [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colpak (Proprietary) Limited 7th Avenue, Kensington Cape Town Western Cape / ZA | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | For all designated states Colpak (Proprietary) Limited 7th Avenue, Kensington Cape Town, Western Cape / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Finsterbusch, Hans Eberhard 1104 Silverstream, Disa Park, Highlands Estate Cape Town, Western Cape / ZA | [1996/19] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308148.9 | 04.11.1994 | [1996/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0710443 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A22C13/00 | [1996/19] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
A22C13/00 (EP);
A22C13/0013 (EP);
B32B1/08 (US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/306 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/34 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B5/022 (US);
A22C2013/0069 (EP);
B32B2307/31 (US);
B32B2439/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, FR, GB, NL [1996/19] | Title | German: | Hülle für pastöse Substanzen | [1996/19] | English: | Casings for containing paste | [1996/19] | French: | Enveloppes pour des substances pâteuses | [1996/19] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 12.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/27] | 03.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.01.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3930834 (TEXDA TEXTIL DARM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB1060403 (WOLFF & COMPANY KOMMANDITGESEL) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPS76133441 (KUREHA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-10; | [A]DE2128613 (W. FALLER) [A] 1 * claims 1-15 *; | [A]DE2352553 (LISSMANN ALKOR WERK) [A] 1 * claims 1-4 * | [Y] - "MANUFACTURE OF SAUSAGE CASINGS", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19770425), vol. 86, no. 17, Database accession no. 119537w, page 40, column 1 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * |