EP0653401 - Use of supported palladium and gold catalysts in the preparation of tertiary butyl alcohol from tertiary butyl hydroperoxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/20] | Use of supported palladium, catalysts in the preparation of tertiary butyl alcohol from tertiary butyl hydroperoxide | ||
[1997/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman Specialty Chemicals Corporation 7114 North Lamar Boulevard Austin, Texas 78761 / US | [1997/35] |
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains, New York 10650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanderson, John Ronald 15290 Faubion Trail Leander, Texas 78641 / US | 02 /
Knifton, John Frederick 10900 Catskill Trail Austin, Texas 78726 / US | 03 /
Duranleau, Roger George Box 87, Route 5 Georgetown, Texas 78626 / US | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/20] | Green, Mark Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308293.3 | 10.11.1994 | [1995/20] | Priority number, date | US19930150919 | 12.11.1993 Original published format: US 150919 | [1995/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0653401 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0653401 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/132, C07C29/88 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
C07C29/132 (EP,US);
C07C29/88 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/132, C07C31/12 (EP,US);
C07C29/88, C07C31/12 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/20] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Palladium- und Gold-Trägerkatalysatoren zur Herstellung von Tertiärbutylalkohol aus Tertiärbutylhydroperoxid | [1997/33] | English: | Use of supported palladium and gold catalysts in the preparation of tertiary butyl alcohol from tertiary butyl hydroperoxide | [1997/33] | French: | Utilisation de catalyseurs de palladium et or supportés dans la préparation de l'alcool tertiobutylique de l'hydropéroxide tertiobutylique | [1997/33] |
Former [1995/20] | Verwendung von Palladium Trägerkatalysatoren zur Herstellung von Tertiärbutylalkohol aus Tertiärbutylhydroperoxid | ||
Former [1995/20] | Use of supported palladium, catalysts in the preparation of tertiary butyl alcohol from tertiary butyl hydroperoxide | ||
Former [1995/20] | Utilisation de catalyseurs de palladium supportés dans la préparation de l'alcool tertiobutylique de l'hydropéroxide tertiobutylique | Examination procedure | 26.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/52] | 06.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US2854487 (CHESELDEN QUIN DENIS) [DA] 1 * example - *; | [DA]US4704482 (SANDERSON JOHN R [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column W *; | [DA]US4705903 (SANDERSON JOHN R [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column W * |