EP0659987 - Catalyst monitor for a Y pipe exhaust configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex / GB | For:FR
FORD FRANCE S.A. B.P. 307 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werk Köln-Niehl, Henry Ford Strasse, Postfach 60 04 02 50735 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex / GB | ||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE S. A. B.P. 307 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | |||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werk Köln-Niehl, Henry Ford Strasse, Postfach 60 04 02 50735 Köln / DE | |||
Former [1995/26] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex / GB | ||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE S. A. B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | |||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werk Köln-Niehl, Henry Ford Strasse, Postfach 60 04 02 D-50735 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wade, Wallace Robert 31456 Glouster Circle Farmington Hills, Michigan 48331 / US | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308557.1 | 21.11.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | US19930167303 | 16.12.1993 Original published format: US 167303 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659987 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659987 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F01N7/00, F02D41/14 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
F01N11/007 (EP,US);
F01N2550/02 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/26] | Title | German: | Katalysatorüberwachung für Y-Abgasrohranordnung | [1995/26] | English: | Catalyst monitor for a Y pipe exhaust configuration | [1995/26] | French: | Surveillance de catalyseur pour un tube de gaz de combustion en configuration Y | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/06] | 20.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5228287 (KURONISHI KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 23 - line 32 * * column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 38; figure - *; | [A]JPH05180043 ; | US5279114 [ ] (KURITA NORIAKI [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931108), vol. 17, no. 604, Database accession no. (M - 1506), & JP05180043 A 19930720 (NIPPONDENSO) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |