EP0655814 - Surge arrester with insulative support bracket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joslyn Manufacturing Company 30 South Wacker Drive Chicago Illinois 60606 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | For all designated states Joslyn Manufacturing Company 30 South Wacker Drive Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osterhout, Joseph C. 14637 Mallard Lane County of Will, Illinois / US | 02 /
Maroney, Michael R. 10910 S. Washtenaw County of Cook, Illinois / US | [1995/22] | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | SERJEANTS 25, The Crescent King Street Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94308786.6 | 29.11.1994 | [1995/22] | Priority number, date | deleted | [1996/04] |
Former [1995/22] | US19930158949 | 29.11.1993 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0655814 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01T1/14, H01C7/12 | [1995/22] | CPC: |
H01C7/12 (EP);
H01C7/126 (EP);
H01T1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, LI, PT, SE [1995/22] | Title | German: | Überspannungsableiter mit isolierenden Trägerarm | [1995/22] | English: | Surge arrester with insulative support bracket | [1995/22] | French: | Dérivateur de surtensions à bras de support isolateur | [1995/22] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 30.03.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 23.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 01.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/35] | 25.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4609902 (HARVEY HUBBEL INC.) [X] 1,4-12 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 49; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,3 |