EP0657387 - Distilling tube apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMIZU CORPORATION 1-2-3 Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | For all designated states KUBUTO CORPORATION 1-27-47 Shikizu Hagashi, Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | For all designated states JAPAN GORETEX 1-42-5 Akatsutsumi Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states SHIMIZU CORPORATION 1-2-3 Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | ||
For all designated states KUBUTO CORPORATION 1-27-47 Shikizu Hagashi, Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | |||
For all designated states JAPAN GORETEX 1-42-5 Akatsutsumi Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Masaru Shimizu Corporation, 1-2-3 Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tanigawa, Atsushi Kubota Corporation, 1-2-47 Shikizu Higashi Naniwa-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Otsuka, Yoshiyuki Shimizu Corporation, 1-2-3 Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Moriya, Hironori Japan Goretex, 1-42-5 Akatsutsumi Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Hiraga, Yoshihiko Kubota Corporation, 1-2-47 Shikizu Higashi Naniwa-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 06 /
Kobayashi, Masayuki Japan Goretex, 1-42-5 Akatsutsumi Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Horner, Martin Grenville Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Horner, Martin Grenville Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309132.2 | 07.12.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | JP19930306876 | 07.12.1993 Original published format: JP 30687693 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0657387 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/14, B01D61/36, A01G25/00, A01G25/06, B01D1/04 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
B01D61/3641 (EP,US);
A01G25/00 (EP,US);
A01G25/06 (EP,US);
B01D1/04 (EP,US);
C02F1/14 (EP,US);
A01G2009/248 (EP,US);
Y02A20/212 (EP,US);
Y02A40/25 (EP,US);
Y10S159/27 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/24] | Title | German: | Rohr Destilliervorrichtung | [1995/24] | English: | Distilling tube apparatus | [1995/24] | French: | Dispositif de distillation en forme de (tube) tuyaux | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 03.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/28] | 16.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0164326 (SVENSKA UTVECKLINGS AB [SE]); | [X]US4698135 (RAAB SIMON [CA]) |