EP0661878 - A network-based system enabling image communications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2000 [2000/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1995/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merritt, Andrew 530 Park Avenue Apt G-2 Orange, New Jersey 07050 / US | 02 /
Rosen, Kenneth H. 107 Red Hill Road Middletown, New Jersey 07748 / US | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk, Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [1998/02] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [1995/27] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309179.3 | 09.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | US19930175022 | 29.12.1993 Original published format: US 175022 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0661878 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0661878 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | [1999/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04N7/00, H04M3/50, H04M11/08, H04N1/00 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
H04M3/5307 (EP);
H04M3/4228 (EP);
H04M7/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/27] | H04N7/00, H04M3/50, H04M11/08 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/27] | Title | German: | Auf einem Netzwerk basierendes System mit Bildkommunikation | [1995/27] | English: | A network-based system enabling image communications | [1995/27] | French: | Système basé sur un réseau permettant des communications d'images | [1995/27] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/07] | 30.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH05268450 ; | [A]JPS57159188 ; | [Y]EP0529864 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-11 * figures 2,4; claim 1 *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940120), vol. 018, no. 038, Database accession no. (E - 1495), & JP05268450 A 19931015 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821223), vol. 006, no. 264, Database accession no. (E - 150), & JP57159188 A 19821001 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - "WORKSTATION MULTIMEDIA HUB", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19930901), vol. 36, no. 9B, page 387/388, XP000397198 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |