EP0657891 - Databus architecture for accelerated column access in RAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mosaid Technologies Incorporated P.O. Box 13579 Kanata, ON K2K 1X6 / CA | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka, 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states Mosaid Technologies Incorporated P.O. Box 13579 Kanata, Ontario K2K 1X6 / CA | ||
For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka, 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | |||
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states Mosaid Technologies Incorporated P.O. Box 13579 Kanata, Ontario K2K 1X6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graham, Allan 10 Carbery Drive Stittsville, Ontario K2S 1E4 / CA | 02 /
Larochelle, Francis 21 De La Sarcelle, Hull Quebec, J9A 2V5 / CA | [1995/33] |
Former [1995/24] | 01 /
Allan, Graham 118, Beechfern Drive, Stittsville Ontario, K2S 1E4 / CA | ||
02 /
Larochelle, Francis 21 De La Sarcelle, Hull Quebec, J9A 2V5 / CA | Representative(s) | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | O'Connell, David Christopher HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309205.6 | 09.12.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | US19930164703 | 10.12.1993 Original published format: US 164703 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0657891 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0657891 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657891 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/00 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
G11C11/407 (KR);
G11C7/1048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/24] | Title | German: | Datenbusstruktur für beschleunigten Spaltenzugriff in einem RAM | [1995/24] | English: | Databus architecture for accelerated column access in RAM | [1995/24] | French: | Architecture de bus de données pour accès accéléré de colonne d'une RAM | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 07.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38] | Request for further processing for: | 23.03.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.04.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH1128292 ; | [PX]US5371716 (YAMANAKA MUTSUMI [JP]) [PX] 1-11 * column W * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890821), vol. 13, no. 375, Database accession no. (P - 921), & JP1128292 A 00000000 (MATSUMOTO) [X] 1-6 * abstract * [A] 7,9 |