EP0659886 - Enzymatic conversion of proteins using immobilized dictyostelium dipeptidylaminopeptidase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atkinson, Paul Robert 3381 W. 48th Street Indianpolis, Indiana 46208 / US | 02 /
Foster, Lisa Kay 4263 Fox Ridge Avenue Greenwood, Indiana 46143 / US | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Denholm, Anna Marie, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Center Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [2009/26] |
Former [2001/29] | Denholm, Anna Marie, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited, Lilli Research Centre, Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [1995/26] | Hudson, Christopher Mark, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309313.8 | 14.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | US19930172501 | 22.12.1993 Original published format: US 172501 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659886 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659886 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/06 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
C07K14/62 (EP,KR,US);
C07K1/12 (KR);
C07K1/18 (KR);
C12N9/58 (EP,US);
C12P21/06 (EP,US);
C12Y304/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI [2002/09] |
Former [1995/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | 29.12.1994 | SI | 29.12.1994 | Title | German: | Enzymatische Umsetzung von Proteinen unter Verwendung immobilisierter Dipeptidylaminopeptidase aus Dictyostelium | [1995/26] | English: | Enzymatic conversion of proteins using immobilized dictyostelium dipeptidylaminopeptidase | [1995/26] | French: | Conversion enzymatique de protéines par utilisation de dipeptidylaminopeptidase immobilisée de Dictyostelium | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 23.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Request for further processing for: | 08.07.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 08.07.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.07.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.02.1999 | 31.12.1999 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 03.10.2002 | [2003/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9002813 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-4; | [DA]US5126249 (BECKER GERALD W [US], et al)[DA] 1-4,19,20; | [X]EP0557076 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 1-5,19,20; | [XPD]EP0595476 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [XPD] 1-5,19,20 |