EP0659425 - 2-Phenyl-3-azoylbenzothiophenes for increasing macrophage function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zuckerman, Steven Harold 7710 Wawasee Drive Indianapolis, Indiana 46250 / US | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Vaughan, Jennifer Ann, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Vaughan, Jennifer Ann, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [1995/32] | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [1995/26] | Tapping, Kenneth George Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309483.9 | 19.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | US19930170605 | 21.12.1993 Original published format: US 170605 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659425 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445, A61K31/40, A61K31/38, A61P37/04 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/4535 (KR);
A61K31/38 (EP,US);
A61K31/4025 (KR);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61P37/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1995/26] | A61K31/445, A61K31/40, A61K31/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DK, GR, IE, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2002/13] |
Former [1995/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | 02.01.1995 | SI | 02.01.1995 | Title | German: | 2-Phenyl-3-Azoylbenzothiophene zur Erhöhung der makrophagen Funktion | [1995/26] | English: | 2-Phenyl-3-azoylbenzothiophenes for increasing macrophage function | [1995/26] | French: | 2-Phényl-3-azoylbenzothiophènes pour augmenter la fonction des macrophages | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 24.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/48] | 25.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4133814 (JONES C DAVID, et al) [DA] 1-6* column A; claim - *; | [DA]US4418068 (JONES CHARLES D [US]) [DA] 1-6 * column A; claim - *; | [A]EP0222385 (JAPAN RES DEV CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column W *; | [A]US5075321 (SCHREIBER ALAN D [US]) [A] 1-6 * column W * | [A] - M.C. SANDERS ET AL., "HORMONAL MODULATION OF MACROPHAGE CLEARANCE OF IgG-SENSITIZED CELLS", TRANS. ASSOC. AM. PHYSICIANS, vol. 100, pages 268 - 275 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - S.A. AHMED ET AL., "SEX HORMONES AND THE IMMUNE SYSTEM", BAILLIERE'S CLINICAL RHEUMATOLOGY, vol. 4, no. 1, pages 13 - 31 [A] 1-6 * summary pages 26-27 *; page 25 * |