EP0659426 - 2-Phenyl-3-azoylbenzothiophenes for treating pulmonary hypertensive diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zuckerman, Steven Harold 7710 Wawasee Drive Indianapolis, Indiana 46250 / US | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Vaughan, Jennifer Ann, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Vaughan, Jennifer Ann, et al Eli Lilly and Company Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [1995/32] | Tapping, Kenneth George, et al Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | ||
Former [1995/26] | Tapping, Kenneth George Lilly Industries Limited European Patent Operations Erl Wood Manor Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309484.7 | 19.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | US19930171386 | 21.12.1993 Original published format: US 171386 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659426 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445, A61K31/40, A61K31/38 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/4535 (KR);
A61K31/38 (EP,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/4025 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/26] | Extension states | LT | 02.01.1995 | SI | 02.01.1995 | Title | German: | 2-Phenyl-3-Azoylbenzothiopene zur Behandlung von pulmonaler Hypertomie | [1995/26] | English: | 2-Phenyl-3-azoylbenzothiophenes for treating pulmonary hypertensive diseases | [1995/26] | French: | 2-Phényl-3-azoylbenzothiophènes pour traiter l'hypertension pulmonaire | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 24.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/40] | 03.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3947470 (BRENNER L MARTIN, et al) [A] 1-4 * column A * * column 1, line 1 - line 10; claim - *; | [A] - C.D. JONES ET AL., "ANTIESTROGENS.2.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 27, no. 8, pages 1057 - 1066 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | [A] - DATABASE DIALOG, FILE 129: PHIND, AN=00357924 [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [ ] - SCRIP, (19930408), vol. 1812, page 31 | [DA] - M.Y. FARHAT ET AL., "PROTECTION BY OESTRADIOL AGAINST THE DEVELOPMENT OF CARDIOVASCULAR CHANGES ASSOCIATED WITH MONOCROTALINE PULMONARY HYPERTENSION IN RATS", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, vol. 110, no. 2, pages 719 - 723 [DA] 1-4 * the whole document * | [A] - B.L. NEUBAUER ET AL., "COMPARATIVE ANTITUMOR EFFECTS OF HORMONAL ABLATION, ESTROGEN AGONIST, ESTROGEN CYTOTOXIC DERIVATIVE, AND ANTIESTROGEN IN THE PAIII RAT PROSTATIC ADENOCARCINOMA", CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 52, no. 17, pages 4663 - 4671, XP001093983 [A] 1-4 * abstract * |