EP0661458 - Clutch apparatus for a rotary compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORD MOTOR COMPANY The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strikis, Guntis Viktors 47540 W. Huron River Drive Belleville, Michigan 48111 / US | 02 /
Khetarpal, Vipen Kumar 24268 Bramblewood Drive Novi, Michigan 48734 / US | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/10] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | ||
Former [1995/27] | Messulam, Alec Moses A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309522.4 | 19.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | US19930172781 | 27.12.1993 Original published format: US 172781 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0661458 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0661458 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F04C29/00, F16D27/11 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
F04C28/06 (EP,US);
F04C29/0057 (EP,US);
F16D27/118 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/27] | Title | German: | Kupplungseinrichtung für Drehkolbenverdichter | [1995/27] | English: | Clutch apparatus for a rotary compressor | [1995/27] | French: | Dispositif d'embrayage pour compresseur rotatif | [1995/27] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 10.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05968587 ; | [A]JPH05963392 ; | [A]GB364330 (FRITZ SEEBERGER) [A] 1,7* page 1, line 58 - page 2, line 28; figure . *; | [A]DE3243431 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,7 * page 6, paragraph L - page 11; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840815), vol. 8, no. 177, Database accession no. (M - 317)<1614>, & JP5968587 A 19840418 (TOYODA JIDO SHOKKI SEISAKUSHO) [A] 1,7,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840807), vol. 8, no. 170, Database accession no. (M - 315)<1607>, & JP5963392 A 19840411 (NISSAN JIDOSHA) [A] 1,7,9 * abstract * |