EP0661702 - Apparatus and method for error recovery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nylander-Hill, Pamela Ruth 9010 East Harborage Drive Tucson, Arizona 85710 / US | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Williams, Julian David IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Mail Point 110 Hursley Park, Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Williams, Julian David IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309657.8 | 21.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | US19930174656 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: US 174656 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0661702 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0661702 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/18, G11B27/36 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
G06F3/0601 (EP,US);
G11B15/026 (EP,US);
G11B20/10009 (EP,US);
G11B20/18 (EP,US);
G11B20/1833 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/27] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Fehlerbeseitigung | [1995/27] | English: | Apparatus and method for error recovery | [1995/27] | French: | Appareil et méthode de redressement d'erreur | [1995/27] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 09.02.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4866712 (CHAO MING-TE [US]) [X] 1-3,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 68 * * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 62 * * claims 1-8 *; | [Y]EP0294287 (CAB TEK INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,15 * page 4, line 50 - page 5, line 12 * * page 5, line 44 - line 56 * * page 7, line 3 - line 44 * * page 8, line 54 - page 9, line 15 * * figures 5,7,8 *; | [A]EP0339874 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1,15 * column 2, line 4 - line 21 * * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 15 * * figure 3 *; | [A]JPH03290877 ; | [A]JPS5955548 ; | [YP]US5331476 (FRY SCOTT M [US], et al) [YP] 1,2,15 * the whole document *; | [L]US5386324 (FRY SCOTT M [US], et al) [L] 1-3,15 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920330), vol. 016, no. 125, Database accession no. (P - 1331), & JP03290877 A 19911220 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-3,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840724), vol. 008, no. 159, Database accession no. (P - 289), & JP59055548 A 19840330 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) |