Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0669676
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.02.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.03.2000 [2000/13] |
19.02.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.04.1999 [1999/14] |
11.01.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.12.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.12.1998 |
Change - designated states |
published on 03.02.1999 [1999/05] |
29.09.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.09.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.09.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
15.05.1998 |
First examination report |
|
08.05.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.04.1998 |
Change - German title |
published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] |
15.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.07.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] |
21.12.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.12.1996 |
Publication of search report |
published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] |
14.07.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.08.1995 [1995/35] |