EP0669676 - Patch panel idc connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.2000 [2000/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caherec, Alain 26 rue des Anglais F-78700 Conflans Sainte Honorine / FR | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309670.1 | 22.12.1994 | [1995/35] | Priority number, date | FR19940002039 | 23.02.1994 Original published format: FR 9402039 | [1995/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0669676 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0669676 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | [1997/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0669676 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/24 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
H01R4/2433 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/05] |
Former [1995/35] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Schalttafelverbinder mit Isolationsverdrängungsklemmen | [1998/22] | English: | Patch panel idc connector | [1995/35] | French: | Tableau de commutation avec connecteur à déplacement d'isolant | [1995/35] |
Former [1995/35] | Schalttafel mit Isolationsverdrängungsklemmen | Examination procedure | 27.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3701274 (SIMON GUY) [A] 1-12* figure -; example - *; | [A]US4793823 (COZZENS BRIAN E [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2623024 (ARNOULD APP ELECTR [FR]) [A] 1-12 * figure -; claim - * |