blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0666034

EP0666034 - Process for preparing fractionated soybean proteins and foods using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI OIL COMPANY, LIMITED
1-5, Nishishinsaibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu 542 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/32]For all designated states
FUJI OIL COMPANY, LIMITED
1-5, Nishishinsaibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 542 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Samato, Masahiko
6-4-5, Kinunodai, Yawara-mura
Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
02 / Akasaka, Takeshi
5-7-1, Kinunodai, Yawara-mura
Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
03 / Mori, Hiroyuki
1-5-24, Tsukusino, Abiko-shi
Chiba-ken / JP
[1995/32]
Representative(s)Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/32]Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London, EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date94309688.322.12.1994
[1995/32]
Priority number, dateJP1994000062007.01.1994         Original published format: JP 62094
JP1994028842522.11.1994         Original published format: JP 28842594
[1995/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0666034
Date:09.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0666034
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.1995
ClassificationIPC:A23J3/16, A23L1/305
[1995/32]
CPC:
A23J3/16 (EP,US); A23L33/185 (EP,US); A61P37/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1995/32]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von fraktionierten Sojaproteinen und Verwendung desselben in Nahrungsmitteln[2000/21]
English:Process for preparing fractionated soybean proteins and foods using the same[1995/32]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication de protéines de soja fractionnées et aliments qui les utilisent[1995/32]
Former [1995/32]Verfahren zur Herstellung von franktionierten Sojaproteinen und Verwendung desselben in Nahrungsmitteln
Examination procedure26.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/38]
10.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.1999Fee for grant paid
26.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPS5235739  ;
 [XA]JPH0543597  ;
 JPH0543597  [ ];
 [A]JPS55124457  ;
 [A]EP0072094  (STALEY MFG CO A E [US]) [A] 1,2,4-10 * page 4, line 19 - page 10, line 14; example 1; claims 1-5,7 *;
 [XA]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 40, no. 77, Database accession no. 77-71924, & JPS5235739 A 19770910 (NODA INST. SCI. RES.) [X] 1,4-7,9,10 * abstract * [A] 2,3,11
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930630), vol. 017, no. 345, Database accession no. (C - 1077), & JP05043597 A 19930223 (FUJI OIL CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,9 * abstract * [A] 5-7,10
    [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 13, no. 93, Database accession no. 93-104291, & JPH0543597 A 19930223 (FUJI OIL CO LTD) [ ] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801216), vol. 004, no. 0182, Database accession no. (C - 035), & JP55124457 A 19800925 (NODA SANGYO KAGAKU KENKYUSHO) [A] 1,2,4-7,9 * abstract *
 [A]  - ANDERSON, WOLF, GLOVER, "EXTRACTION OF SOYBEAN MEAL PROTEINS WITH SALT SOLUTIONS AT pH 4.5", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, vol. 21, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1021/jf60186a022, pages 251 - 254, XP002678753 [A] 3-7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf60186a022
 [A]  - IWABUCHI, YAMAUCHI, "determination of glycinin and beta-conglycinin in soybean proteins by immunological methods", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, vol. 35, no. 2, pages 200 - 205 [A] 2-7,9,10
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.