EP0661825 - Portable radio apparatus with rotating antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagai, Michio, c/o NEC Corp. 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309816.0 | 23.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | JP19930335272 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33527293 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0661825 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0661825 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38, H01Q1/24 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
H04B1/3833 (EP,US);
H01Q1/244 (EP,US);
H01Q1/245 (EP,US);
H04M1/0214 (EP,US);
H04M1/0247 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, SE [1995/27] | Title | German: | Funkgerät mit rotierender Antenne | [1995/27] | English: | Portable radio apparatus with rotating antenna | [1995/27] | French: | Appareil radio portable avec antenne rotative | [1995/27] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/33] | 10.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 13.06.2002 | [2002/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0508567 (SHAYE COMMUNICATIONS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [A] 2,5,6,11; | [A]EP0508299 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,6,11* column 2, line 2 - line 30; figure 1 * | Examination | US5260998 |