Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0660200
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.04.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] |
28.04.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] |
24.02.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.01.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.12.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
07.12.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
12.01.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.01.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.12.1997 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
13.12.1997 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
09.12.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.12.1997 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
16.09.1997 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
27.06.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.02.1997 |
First examination report |
|
06.02.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.01.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] |
09.01.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.06.1996 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] |
12.05.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.06.1995 [1995/26] |