Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07181806 | Global Dossier | 21.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | JP34798093 | 24.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07181804 | Global Dossier | 21.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | JP34798193 | 24.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0660200 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2000 | B1 | EP0660200 | 14.08.1996 | A3 | EP0660200 | 28.06.1995 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP34798093 | 24.12.1993 | JP34798193 | 24.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69424926T | 02.11.2000 | T2 | DE69424926D1 | 20.07.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP34798093 | 24.12.1993 | JP34798193 | 24.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2146641T | 16.08.2000 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP34798093 | 24.12.1993 | JP34798193 | 24.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1012048 | 23.07.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP34798093 | 24.12.1993 | JP34798193 | 24.12.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5682585 | 28.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP34798093 | 24.12.1993 | JP34798193 | 24.12.1993 |