EP0660200 - Developing apparatus generating electric field between developer carrying member and developer layer regulating member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Seiji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sakurai, Kazushige, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Suwa, Kouichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Sato, Hiroshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Sano, Tetsuya, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Inoue, Takahiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Kato, Junichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Ojima, Masaki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 09 /
Inami, Satoru, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 10 /
Ando, Atsutoshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309831.9 | 23.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | JP19930347980 | 24.12.1993 Original published format: JP 34798093 | JP19930347981 | 24.12.1993 Original published format: JP 34798193 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0660200 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0660200 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0660200 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08, G03G15/09 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
G03G15/09 (EP,US);
G03G13/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/26] | Title | German: | Entwicklungsgerät welches ein elektrisches Feld zwischen Entwicklerträger und Entwicklerschichtregulierer erzeugt | [1995/26] | English: | Developing apparatus generating electric field between developer carrying member and developer layer regulating member | [1995/26] | French: | Appareil de développement produissant un champ électrique entre un membre porteur de développateur et un membre réglant la couche de développateur | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 10.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/22] | Request for further processing for: | 26.11.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 26.11.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5794767 ; | [A]JPS6129868 ; | [A]JPH0194368 ; | [A]JPS59174861 ; | [X]US4286543 (OHNUMA TERUYUKI, et al) [X] 10-19,21 * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 32 * * column 14, line 29 - line 32; figures 8-10 *; | [X]JPS5872971 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 10,21 * figures 2,4 *; | JPH05872971 [ ]; | [A]JPS602967 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820914), vol. 006, no. 179, Database accession no. (P - 142), & JP57094767 A 19820612 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-4,8,9 * abstract * | [XY] - KAZUO TERAO ET AL, "PRODUCTION OF THIN, UNIFORM TONER LAYERS THROUGH USE OF A CONTACT BLADE WITH MONO-COMPONENT DEVELOPMENT SYSTEMS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, (19910501), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 495 - 500, XP000234885 [X] 20,21 * figures 15,16 * [Y] 1-4,8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/28.81833 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860626), vol. 010, no. 183, Database accession no. (P - 472), & JP61029868 A 19860210 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890725), vol. 013, no. 329, Database accession no. (P - 904), & JP01094368 A 19890413 (CANON INC) [A] 7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850208), vol. 009, no. 030, Database accession no. (P - 333), & JP59174861 A 19841003 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830723), vol. 7, no. 168, Database accession no. (P - 212)<1313>, & JP5872971 A 00000000 (FUIJI XEROX KK) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850521), vol. 009, no. 116, Database accession no. (P - 357), & JP60002967 A 19850109 (FUJI XEROX KK) [A] 14 * abstract * |