EP0609152 - Motor vehicle roof rack bar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.1997 [1997/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T.E.F. Route de Bretigny, Port de Bonneuil F-94380 Bonneuil Sur Marne / FR | [1994/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Besnard, Jean 29 bis, rue de Champigny F-94430 Chennevieres Sur Marne / FR | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al Cabinet Z. Weinstein 20, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400181.7 | 27.01.1994 | [1994/31] | Priority number, date | FR19930000882 | 28.01.1993 Original published format: FR 9300882 | [1994/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609152 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/058 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
B60R9/058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/31] | Title | German: | Dachträgerholm für Kraftfahrzeug | [1994/31] | English: | Motor vehicle roof rack bar | [1994/31] | French: | Barre de toit pour véhicule automobile | [1994/31] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 03.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 01.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/05] | 29.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB699968 (P.H.C. VAN HOORN) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0205414 (KAMI, KALIX MEKANISKA INDUSTRIER AB) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 38 - line 39; figure 4 * * column 7, line 33 - line 58; figure 6 *; | [A]US2589772 (R.E. CARTER ET AL.) [A] 1 * column 2, line 24 - line 30; figure 2 *; | [A]FR2675095 (AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT ET AL.) [A] 1,4 * page 4, line 15 - line 27; figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP0338633 (CAM COSTRUZIONE AUTOACCESSORI MILANO S.R.L.) [A] 2 * column 6, line 8 - line 16; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0354104 (APPLICATIONS TECHNIQUES MÉCANIQUES A.T.M. S.A.) |