Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.1997 [1997/05] |
27.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
10.02.1995 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] |
17.06.1994 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] |