EP0610129 - Method for launching and controlling, from a moving vehicle, a non-vertically guided projectile with braked trajectory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE D'APPLICATIONS GENERALES D'ELECTRICITE ET DE MECANIQUE SAGEM 6, Avenue d'Iéna 75783 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states SOCIETE D'APPLICATIONS GENERALES D'ELECTRICITE ET DE MECANIQUE SAGEM 6, Avenue d'Iéna F-75783 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duclos, François 3, rue François Villon F-95000 Cergy / FR | 02 /
Lhote, Didier 47 ter, avenue des Bonshommes F-95290 l'Isle Adam / FR | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Bloch, Gérard 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400209.6 | 01.02.1994 | [1994/32] | Priority number, date | FR19930001093 | 02.02.1993 Original published format: FR 9301093 | [1994/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610129 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0610129 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F41G9/02 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
F41G9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1994/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Abschuss und zur Steuerung von einem bewegbaren Fahrzeug eines nicht vertikal gelenkten Geschosses mit gebremstem Flugweg | [1994/32] | English: | Method for launching and controlling, from a moving vehicle, a non-vertically guided projectile with braked trajectory | [1994/32] | French: | Procédé de lancement et de contrôle, à partir d'un véhicule mobile, d'un projectile non guidé verticalement et à trajectoire freinée | [1994/32] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 22.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4121246 (FADDEN DELMAR MCLEAN, et al) [A] 1,8 * column A * * column 1, line 61 - column 4, line 11; figures 1-4; tables 1-4 *; | [A]US3689741 (SJOBERG BENGT, et al) [A] 1,8 * column A * * column 3, line 38 - column 18, line 59; figures 1-23 *; | [PX]FR2681675 (THOMSON BRANDT ARMEMENTS [FR]) [PX] 1,8 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 7, line 12; figures 1-6 *; | [PX]FR2681676 (THOMSON BRANDT ARMEMENTS [FR]) [PX] 1,8 * abstract * * page 2, line 14 - page 5, line 3; figures 1-3 * |