Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
28.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.1998 [1998/03] |
06.12.1996 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] |
25.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
10.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
22.03.1996 | First examination report | |
20.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant | |
29.02.1996 | Renewal fee | |
05.07.1995 | Change - representative | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] |
04.01.1995 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] |
08.07.1994 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] |