Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5658015 | 19.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US46304695 | 05.06.1995 | US19829994 | 18.02.1994 | FR9301906 | 19.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0612051 | Global Dossier | 22.01.1997 | B1 | EP0612051 | 24.08.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9301906 | 19.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69401519T | 05.06.1997 | T2 | DE69401519D1 | 06.03.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9301906 | 19.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2099547T | 16.05.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9301906 | 19.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2701782 | 14.04.1995 | B1 | FR2701782 | 26.08.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9301906 | 19.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5575096 | 19.11.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9301906 | 19.02.1993 |