EP0614240 - Rechargeable lithium containing electrochemical generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states SAFT 156, avenue de Metz F-93230 Romainville / FR | ||
Former [1997/37] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1994/36] | For all designated states SAFT 156, avenue de Metz F-93230 Romainville / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perton, Françoise Le Champ de la Plaine F-86190 Beruges / FR | 02 /
Baudry, Sylvie 29, route de Poitiers F-86240 Fontaine le Comte / FR | 03 /
Porcheron, Annie 3, Cité des Gally F-86240 Smarves / FR | [1994/36] | Representative(s) | Laroche, Danièle, et al ALCATEL ALSTHOM, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [1997/37] |
Former [1994/36] | Laroche, Danièle, et al c/o SOSPI 14-16 rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400434.0 | 01.03.1994 | [1994/36] | Priority number, date | FR19930002396 | 02.03.1993 Original published format: FR 9302396 | [1994/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0614240 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0614240 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/40 | [1994/36] | CPC: |
H01M10/0569 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/36] | Title | German: | Aufladbarer lithiumenthaltender elektrochemischen Stromgenerator | [1994/36] | English: | Rechargeable lithium containing electrochemical generator | [1994/36] | French: | Générateur électrochimique rechargeable au lithium | [1994/36] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 07.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]FR2641130 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [US]) [DX] 1,5,6,8 * page 8, line 18 - line 35 * * page 10, line 26 - page 12, line 25 * * claims 1-7 *; | JPH02172163 [ ] (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [Y]JPH0513088 ; | [Y]JPH0355769 ; | [A]JPH04155775 ; | [A]USH1076H (STEVEN M. SLANE) [A] 1 * column 2, line 2 - line 66 * * claims 1-3 *; | [DA]EP0482287 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * claims 1-3 *; | [DA]EP0490048 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [DA] 1,2,6-9 * claims 1-15 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930526), vol. 17, no. 272, Database accession no. (E - 1371), & JP05013088 A 19930122 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910524), vol. 15, no. 204, Database accession no. (E - 1071)<4732> , & JP03055769 A 00000000 (YUASA BATTERY CO LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920914), vol. 16, no. 441, Database accession no. (E - 1264), & JP04155775 A 00000000 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO) [A] 1,7,8 * abstract * |