EP0613818 - Hydraulic clamps device for the suspension of an aircraft store carrying means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R. ALKAN & Cie. Rue du 8 mai 1945 94460 Valenton / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/36] | For all designated states R. ALKAN & Cie. Rue du 8 mai 1945 F-94460 Valenton / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grosselin, Daniel 3, avenue Maurice de Vlaminck F-77680 Roissy en Brie / FR | [1994/36] | Representative(s) | Hud, Robert Cabinet COLLIGNON 15 rue de Surène 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/36] | Hud, Robert Cabinet COLLIGNON 15 rue de Surène F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400463.9 | 04.03.1994 | [1994/36] | Priority number, date | FR19930002598 | 05.03.1993 Original published format: FR 9302598 | [1994/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0613818 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0613818 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B64D1/02, F16B4/00 | [1994/36] | CPC: |
F16B4/002 (EP);
B64D1/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1994/36] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Spannvorrichtung für ein Aussenlastaufhängungsgerät eines Flugzeugs | [1994/36] | English: | Hydraulic clamps device for the suspension of an aircraft store carrying means | [1994/36] | French: | Dispositif de serrage hydraulique pour l'accrochage de moyens d'emport sous aéronefs | [1994/36] | Examination procedure | 23.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 28.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2643332 (MESSERSCHMITT-BOLKOW-BLOHM GMBH) [A] 1 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 3 *; | [A]FR2560303 (ALSTHOM-ATLANTIQUE) [A] 1 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 21 *; | [A]US3033597 (MILLER) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 17 - line 32 *; | [A]FR1092416 (ETABLISSEMENTS NEYRPIC) [A] 2 * page 1, column 2, line 3 - line 11 *; | [A]US3663027 (KLIPPING) [A] 2,3 * column 4, line 15 - line 31 *; | [A]FR1544595 (JERRY TOOLS INC) [A] 4 * page 2, column 1, line 2 - line 14 * |